KS HB2587 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing venue for an agency adoption to be where a state agency or their subcontracting agencies have offices when the state is the agency.
Title
Allowing venue for an agency adoption to be where a state agency or their subcontracting agencies have offices when the state is the agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 1 (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-02-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 1 |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2020-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | House Introduced |