KS HB2581 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the criminal penalties for the crime of giving a false alarm in certain circumstances.
Title
Increasing the criminal penalties for the crime of giving a false alarm in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 02, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sawyer was adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sawyer |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Finch was adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Finch |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2018-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2018-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2018-01-30 | House | House Introduced |