KS HB2579 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 15, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 15, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing compensation for a person who was wrongfully convicted and imprisoned and amending the code of civil procedure concerning contact with jurors following a civil jury trial.
Title
Providing compensation for a person who was wrongfully convicted and imprisoned and amending the code of civil procedure concerning contact with jurors following a civil jury trial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 1 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 1 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-03 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Baumgardner and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2018-03-27 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Finch , Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 1 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained |
2018-02-21 | House | House Representative Ralph raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Becker |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | House Introduced |