KS HB2577 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Kansas right-to-know fee fund and establishing statutory fee maximums for the Kansas right-to-know program.
Title
Creating the Kansas right-to-know fee fund and establishing statutory fee maximums for the Kansas right-to-know program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 04, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, May 1, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-01 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Kerschen, Senator Estes and Senator Francisco appointed as conferees |
2018-04-02 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Sloan , Representative Rahjes and Representative Victors as conferees |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was withdrawn |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-09 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Water and Environment |
2018-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 06, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 582-N |
2018-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water and Environment |
2018-01-30 | House | House Introduced |