KS HB2564 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the version of risk-based capital instructions in effect.
Title
Updating the version of risk-based capital instructions in effect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher appointed as conferees |
2022-03-28 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative S. Johnson , Representative Croft and Representative Neighbor as conferees |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 2, 2022, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-02-15 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2022-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 31, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2022-01-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2022-01-27 | House | House Introduced |