KS HB2537 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the insurance department to hold a hearing in cases involving an order under the Kansas administrative procedure act.
Title
Requiring the insurance department to hold a hearing in cases involving an order under the Kansas administrative procedure act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2022-03-28 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Patton , Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Warren was adopted |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Warren |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 14, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-02-16 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 1, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2022-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-25 | House | House Introduced |