KS HB2536 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the SOUL family legal permanency option for children 16 years of age or older.
Title
Establishing the SOUL family legal permanency option for children 16 years of age or older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 112 Nay: 8 (Y: 112 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 112 Nay: 8 (Y: 112 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 27, 2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 112 Nay: 8 |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-06 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2024-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2024-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2024-01-18 | House | House Introduced |