KS HB2535 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing obsolete provision requiring the state corporation commission and the department of health and environment enter into an interagency agreement for integration of certain oil and gas regulatory operations on or before November 1, 1982.
Title
Repealing obsolete provision requiring the state corporation commission and the department of health and environment enter into an interagency agreement for integration of certain oil and gas regulatory operations on or before November 1, 1982.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2020-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2535/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2535_00_0000.pdf |