KS HB2534 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to the freedom from unsafe restraint and seclusion act.
Title
Amendments to the freedom from unsafe restraint and seclusion act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2016-03-17 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2016-03-17 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 16 , 2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-03-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Children and Seniors |
2016-03-02 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2016-02-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Children and Seniors; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-04 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 09, 2016, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2016-01-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2016-01-26 | House | House Introduced |