KS HB2533 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 08 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 08 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changing interest credit amounts, member distributions upon termination or death and retirement annuities under the KPERS Act of 2015.
Title
Changing interest credit amounts, member distributions upon termination or death and retirement annuities under the KPERS Act of 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 94 Nay: 26 (Y: 94 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Lane was rejected - Yea: 45 Nay: 73 (Y: 45 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-02-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 94 Nay: 26 (Y: 94 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Lane was rejected - Yea: 45 Nay: 73 (Y: 45 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 08 April 2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 01, 2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 5, 2014, 3:30 PM, Room 212B-N CANCELED |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 05, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 212B-N |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Senate Select Committee on KPERS |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-02-21 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 94 Nay: 26 |
2014-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Lane was rejected Yea: 45 Nay: 73 |
2014-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Lane |
2014-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 03, 2014, 9:00 AM Room 152-S |
2014-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Pensions and Benefits |
2014-01-29 | House | House Introduced |