KS HB2530 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the commitment procedure of sexually violent predators.
Title
Relating to the commitment procedure of sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 | |
2012-02-14 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced |