KS HB2526 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the chief engineer to adopt rules and regulations under the watershed district act and concerning fees and inspections of dams.
Title
Authorizing the chief engineer to adopt rules and regulations under the watershed district act and concerning fees and inspections of dams.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED |
2024-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Water; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 6, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 218-N - CANCELED |
2024-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water |
2024-01-18 | House | House Introduced |