KS HB2524 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing petitions for a protection from abuse order to include a request for transfer of rights to a wireless telephone number.
Title
Allowing petitions for a protection from abuse order to include a request for transfer of rights to a wireless telephone number.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 5, 2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 02, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 16, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 548-S |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-23 | House | House Introduced |