KS HB2524 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of nursing reinstatement of revoked licenses and reinstatement fee.
Title
Board of nursing reinstatement of revoked licenses and reinstatement fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2014-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 03, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2014-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2014-01-29 | House | House Introduced |