KS HB2516 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raising the number of signatures required for nomination petitions for independent candidates for statewide office and eliminating the option for such candidates to pay a filing fee in lieu of such petitions.
Title
Raising the number of signatures required for nomination petitions for independent candidates for statewide office and eliminating the option for such candidates to pay a filing fee in lieu of such petitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 68 Nay: 52 (Y: 68 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 68 Nay: 52 |
2024-02-22 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 21, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2024-01-25 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 25, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2024-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2024-01-17 | House | House Introduced |