KS HB2515 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2515 by Committee on Education - Concerning postsecondary education; creating the Kansas reinvest in postsecondary education act; regulating private and out-of-state postsecondary educational institutions; clarifying the authority of healing arts schools exempted from the private and out-of-state postsecondary educational institutions act to practice healing arts.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2515 by Committee on Education - Concerning postsecondary education; creating the Kansas reinvest in postsecondary education act; regulating private and out-of-state postsecondary educational institutions; clarifying the authority of healing arts schools exempted from the private and out-of-state postsecondary educational institutions act to practice healing arts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 6 (Y: 116 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 9, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-02-24 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 21, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 6 |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2020-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 30, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2020-01-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2020-01-28 | House | House Introduced |