KS HB2502 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 18, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 18, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the procedure for a county to grant permission to establish swine production facilities.
Title
Amending the procedure for a county to grant permission to establish swine production facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 98 Nay: 26 (Y: 98 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 33 Nay: 7 (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 106 Nay: 8 (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 33 Nay: 7 (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 106 Nay: 8 (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 18, 2012 | |
2012-05-11 | Reengrossed on Friday, 11 May 2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 98 Nay: 26 | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-04-25 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 4 | |
2012-04-25 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-04-25 | Conference committee report now available | |
2012-03-27 | Motion to accede adopted; Senator Taddiken, Senator Teichman and Senator Francisco appointed as conferees | |
2012-03-21 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Powell , Representative Kerschen and Representative Williams as conferees | |
2012-03-20 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 33 Nay: 7 | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bruce was adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bruce | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | |
2012-03-06 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 159-S | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 159-S | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-02-06 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-03 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 106 Nay: 8 | |
2012-02-03 | Engrossed on Thursday, 02 February 2012 | |
2012-02-02 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-02-02 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-01-31 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 783 Docking | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-23 | Introduced |