KS HB2490 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for evaluation of a juvenile offender's academic record, dyslexia screening and reading level assessment and limiting overall juvenile offender case length limit extensions to two extensions and 60 days per extension.
Title
Providing for evaluation of a juvenile offender's academic record, dyslexia screening and reading level assessment and limiting overall juvenile offender case length limit extensions to two extensions and 60 days per extension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate Calendar |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 5, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-08 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2024-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2024-01-25 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 25, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2024-01-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2024-01-10 | House | House Introduced |