KS HB2489 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative review of exceptions to disclosure of public records.
Title
Legislative review of exceptions to disclosure of public records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 12, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-02-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2014-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 05, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2014-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-23 | House | House Introduced |