KS HB2476 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
County treasurer to check claims against delinquent real and personal property tax lists.
Title
County treasurer to check claims against delinquent real and personal property tax lists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2016-02-05 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 10, 2016, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2016-01-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2016-01-19 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li_2016/b2015_16/measures/hb2476/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2476_00_0000.pdf |