KS HB2475 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Kansas highway patrol from conducting commercial motor vehicle spot inspections on certain highways unless certain conditions exist.
Title
Prohibiting the Kansas highway patrol from conducting commercial motor vehicle spot inspections on certain highways unless certain conditions exist.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 20, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2022-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-11 | House | House Introduced |