KS HB2472 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing use of certified drug abuse treatment programs for certain crimes.
Title
Authorizing use of certified drug abuse treatment programs for certain crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 6, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2020-02-05 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 5, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 152-S - CANCELED |
2020-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2020-01-23 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2472/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2472_00_0000.pdf |