KS HB2465 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Report recommending bill be further amended and be passed as amended by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the tax credit for low income students scholarship program act to expand student eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the tax credit for low income students scholarship program act to expand student eligibility.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be further amended and be passed as amended by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2020-03-04HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2020-02-26HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-12HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2020-01-30HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, January 30, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
2020-01-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2020-01-22HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback