KS HB2456 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 13, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 13, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Kansas kids lifetime combination hunting and fishing license.
Title
Establishing the Kansas kids lifetime combination hunting and fishing license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 93 Nay: 20 (Y: 93 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 4 (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 4 (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 13, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Reengrossed on Friday, April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 93 Nay: 20 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Kerschen, Senator Ryckman and Senator Ware appointed as conferees |
2022-03-28 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Corbet , Representative Ryckman and Representative Carlin as conferees |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Peck was adopted |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Peck |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 7, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-02-23 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 22, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 4 |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carpenter, W. was adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carpenter, W. |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-02-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Budget |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2022-01-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Budget |
2022-01-10 | House | House Introduced |
2021-05-26 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, November 12, 2021 |