KS HB2451 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2451 by Committee on Transportation - Increasing registration fees for electric vehicles.
Title
Substitute for HB 2451 by Committee on Transportation - Increasing registration fees for electric vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 94 Nay: 30 (Y: 94 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 64 Nay: 59 (Y: 64 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 64 Nay: 59 (Y: 64 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014 |
2014-04-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 11, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 94 Nay: 30 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Wolf and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees |
2014-04-01 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Proehl , Representative Ryckman Sr. and Representative Perry as conferees |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 2 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 11, 2014, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-02-27 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 64 Nay: 59 |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2014-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2014-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 05, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2014-01-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-16 | House | House Introduced |