KS HB2451 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Approved by Governor on Monday, 05 March 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Approved by Governor on Monday, 05 March 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating "use it or lose it" for groundwater rights in areas closed to new water right development.
Title
Eliminating "use it or lose it" for groundwater rights in areas closed to new water right development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Approved by Governor on Monday, 05 March 2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, February 24, 2012 | |
2012-02-16 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-15 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-02-14 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 159-S | |
2012-02-03 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-02-02 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-02 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-01 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-17 | Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2012, 9:00 AM Room Docking 783 | |
2012-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-12 | Introduced |