KS HB2449 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-08 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, February 08 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-08 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, February 08 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the nonseverability clause in 2015 House Bill No. 2005 and providing for the severability of the provisions of such bill, concerning the judicial branch.
Title
Repealing the nonseverability clause in 2015 House Bill No. 2005 and providing for the severability of the provisions of such bill, concerning the judicial branch.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, February 08 , 2016 |
2016-02-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, February 02, 2016 |
2016-01-29 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, January 29 , 2016 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2016-01-21 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2016-01-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2016-01-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-13 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 14, 2016, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2016-01-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-12 | House | House Introduced |