KS HB2431 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute HB 2431 by Committee on Transportation -- Allowing royalty fees for distinctive license plates to be paid to the county treasurer.
Title
Substitute HB 2431 by Committee on Transportation -- Allowing royalty fees for distinctive license plates to be paid to the county treasurer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Senate Committee | |
2012-03-16 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-03-15 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed on Wednesday, 14 March 2012 | |
2012-03-15 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-14 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended | |
2012-03-14 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hayzlett was adopted | |
2012-03-14 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hayzlett | |
2012-03-14 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2012-03-09 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation | |
2012-03-02 | Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | |
2012-02-21 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 783-DSOB | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced |