KS HB2430 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the sale of certain tobacco settlement receipts; creating the great plains tobacco settlement financing corporation; authorizing the issuance of bonds payable from the tobacco asset payments.
Title
Authorizing the sale of certain tobacco settlement receipts; creating the great plains tobacco settlement financing corporation; authorizing the issuance of bonds payable from the tobacco asset payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-06-01 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, June 01, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2017-05-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-30 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2430/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2430_00_0000.pdf |