KS HB2430 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Contingency reserve fund; extending the time period authorized for districts.
Title
Contingency reserve fund; extending the time period authorized for districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Conference | |
2012-03-27 | Motion to accede adopted; Senator Schodorf, Senator Vratil and Senator Hensley appointed as conferees | |
2012-03-21 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Aurand , Representative Huebert and Representative Ward as conferees | |
2012-03-21 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 152-S | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-02-23 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-23 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 1 | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Otto was rejected | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Otto | |
2012-02-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education | |
2012-01-13 | Hearing: Wednesday, January 18, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 784 Docking | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced |