KS HB2421 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing income tax modifications for global intangible low-taxed income, business interest, capital contributions, FDIC premiums, business meals and payment protection program loans and expenses; expanding the expense deduction availability to income tax taxpayers and calculating the deduction amount; allowing an individual to itemize deductions in Kansas despite not itemizing on their federal return; and exempting from income compensation attributable to unemployment insurance ID fraud.
Title
Providing income tax modifications for global intangible low-taxed income, business interest, capital contributions, FDIC premiums, business meals and payment protection program loans and expenses; expanding the expense deduction availability to income tax taxpayers and calculating the deduction amount; allowing an individual to itemize deductions in Kansas despite not itemizing on their federal return; and exempting from income compensation attributable to unemployment insurance ID fraud.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-02-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-02-24 | House | House Introduced |