KS HB2400 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain remote sellers to collect Kansas sales tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring certain remote sellers to collect Kansas sales tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Died on Calendar
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
2017-03-22HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S
2017-03-17HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2017-03-17HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback