KS HB2396 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2396 by Committee on Reapportionment -- State legislative redistricting; Senate and state board of education member districts.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2396 by Committee on Reapportionment -- State legislative redistricting; Senate and state board of education member districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 79 Nay: 42 (Y: 79 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died on Senate General Orders | |
2012-05-11 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Reapportionment | |
2012-05-09 | Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Reapportionment | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-07 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-03-07 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 79 Nay: 42 | |
2012-03-06 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-03-06 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Dillmore was rejected | |
2012-03-06 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Dillmore | |
2012-03-06 | Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-22 | Introduced |