KS HB2393 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - Stricken from the Calendar (House Rule 2307)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - Stricken from the Calendar (House Rule 2307)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State employees; abolishing longevity bonus.
Title
State employees; abolishing longevity bonus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed - Yea: 55 Nay: 60 (Y: 55 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2011-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed - Yea: 55 Nay: 60 (Y: 55 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2011-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed - Yea: 55 Nay: 60 (Y: 55 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-26 | Stricken from the Calendar (House Rule 2307) | |
2011-05-06 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed Yea: 55 Nay: 60 | |
2011-05-06 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2011-03-28 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-17 | Introduced |