KS HB2391 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-01 - House Motion to concur with amendments failed; Yea: 55 Nay: 58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-01 - House Motion to concur with amendments failed; Yea: 55 Nay: 58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2391 by Committee on Ways and Means - Creating the joint committee on uniform educational standards oversight.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2391 by Committee on Ways and Means - Creating the joint committee on uniform educational standards oversight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-01 - House - House Motion to concur with amendments failed - Yea: 55 Nay: 58 (Y: 55 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 24 Nay: 12 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 64 Nay: 57 (Y: 64 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 24 Nay: 12 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 64 Nay: 57 (Y: 64 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-01 | House | House Motion to concur with amendments failed; Yea: 55 Nay: 58 |
2013-06-01 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 24 Nay: 12 |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Abrams was adopted |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Abrams |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-26 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 64 Nay: 57 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, 26 March 2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Huebert was adopted |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Huebert |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-03-19 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 281-N |
2013-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 281-N-CANCELLED |
2013-03-13 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Education Budget |
2013-03-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-07 | House | House Introduced |