KS HB2386 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - House Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - House Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax deduction for certain expenses related to living donor organ donations.
Title
Income tax deduction for certain expenses related to living donor organ donations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | House | House Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 07, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2013-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2013-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2013-02-28 | House | House Introduced |