KS HB2362 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing state fire marshal approval as a requirement for licensure or renewal of licensure for disability service providers and facilities.
Title
Removing state fire marshal approval as a requirement for licensure or renewal of licensure for disability service providers and facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED |
2023-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED |
2023-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | House | House Introduced |