KS HB2357 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 04 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 04 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
242nd engineer company – KS army national guard – highway.
Title
242nd engineer company – KS army national guard – highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 04 April 2013 |
2013-04-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 02, 2013 |
2013-03-25 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, 25 March 2013 |
2013-03-25 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-01 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2013-02-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 25, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2013-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 582-N--CANCELLED |
2013-02-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-02-15 | House | House Introduced |