KS HB2353 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for free license plates for purple heart recipients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for free license plates for purple heart recipients.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Veterans and Military
2019-02-19HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 218-N
2019-02-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military
2019-02-14HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback