KS HB2352 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Maximum benefits increased for certain members of the Kansas police and firemen's retirement system.
Title
Maximum benefits increased for certain members of the Kansas police and firemen's retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2013, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 152-S |
2013-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Pensions and Benefits |
2013-02-14 | House | House Introduced |