KS HB2350 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 30 Nay: 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the crimes of human smuggling and aggravated human smuggling and providing penalties therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the crimes of human smuggling and aggravated human smuggling and providing penalties therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 30 Nay: 9 (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 85 Nay: 39 (Y: 85 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 96 Nay: 26 (Y: 96 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 2 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 4 (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-27SenateSenate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 30 Nay: 9
2023-04-26HouseHouse Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 85 Nay: 39
2023-04-25HouseHouse Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Monday, April 24, 2023
2023-04-24HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023
2023-04-06HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 96 Nay: 26
2023-04-06SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 2
2023-04-06SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2023-04-04SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson appointed as conferees
2023-04-03HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Owens , Representative Smith, E. and Representative Highberger as conferees
2023-03-29SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
2023-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2023-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2023-03-22SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2023-03-15SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2023-03-02SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-03-01SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2023-03-01HouseHouse Engrossed on Friday, February 24, 2023
2023-02-23HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 4
2023-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2023-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2023-02-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2023-02-15HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
2023-02-08HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2023-02-08HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/hb2350/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/hb2350_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/hb2350_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/hb2350_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/hb2350_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/cr_2023_hb2350_h_1374.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/cr_2023_hb2350_s_1777.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/ccr_2023_hb2350_s_2126.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/fisc_note_hb2350_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2350_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2350_02_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/ccrb_hb2350_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/summary_hb_2350_2023.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230223172218_604301/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230329130118_486662/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230406222345_934661/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230407023448_265450/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230426140459_710257/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230427114523_836913/

Bill Comments

feedback