KS HB2331 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - House Hearing: Monday, February 22, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Commerce, Labor and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for the limited transfer of landowner or tenant deer hunting permits to nonresidents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the limited transfer of landowner or tenant deer hunting permits to nonresidents.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 22, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
2021-02-18HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Agriculture; Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2021-02-10HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Agriculture
2021-02-10HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback