KS HB2328 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing income tax credits for aerospace and aviation program graduates and their employers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing income tax credits for aerospace and aviation program graduates and their employers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2021-03-22HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
2021-03-16HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2021-02-22HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 22, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED
2021-02-10HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2021-02-10HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback