KS HB2322 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - Stricken from the Calendar (House Rule 2307)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - Stricken from the Calendar (House Rule 2307)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to the Kansas offender registration act.
Title
Amendments to the Kansas offender registration act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-26 | Stricken from the Calendar (House Rule 2307) | |
2011-03-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2011-02-23 | Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2011-02-17 | Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2011-02-11 | Introduced |