KS HB2302 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 20, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 20, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2302 by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Making appropriations for the state treasurer for fiscal year 2023 and fiscal year 2024, providing for a transfer of moneys from the state general fund to the state water plan fund for fiscal year 2024, establishing the water technical assistance fund and the water projects grant fund for water-related infrastructure projects.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2302 by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Making appropriations for the state treasurer for fiscal year 2023 and fiscal year 2024, providing for a transfer of moneys from the state general fund to the state water plan fund for fiscal year 2024, establishing the water technical assistance fund and the water projects grant fund for water-related infrastructure projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 3 (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 3 (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 20, 2023 |
2023-04-24 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023 |
2023-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Kerschen, Senator Fagg and Senator Ware appointed as conferees |
2023-04-03 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Minnix , Representative Howerton and Representative Vaughn as conferees |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Thursday, March 16, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-03-01 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 23, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 3 |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Water |
2023-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2023-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water |
2023-02-06 | House | House Introduced |