KS HB2299 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the secretary for children and families to consider foster parents as prospective adoptive parents under certain circumstances.
Title
Directing the secretary for children and families to consider foster parents as prospective adoptive parents under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2023-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be further amended and be passed as amended by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2023-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2023-02-23 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2023-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 8, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2023-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2023-02-06 | House | House Introduced |