KS HB2293 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Motion to reconsider previous action. Failing to meet the required 2/3 majority the motion was rejected. Yea: 18 Nay: 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Motion to reconsider previous action. Failing to meet the required 2/3 majority the motion was rejected. Yea: 18 Nay: 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring prosecutors to disclose their intent to introduce testimony from a jailhouse witness and to forward related information to the Kansas bureau of investigation.
Title
Requiring prosecutors to disclose their intent to introduce testimony from a jailhouse witness and to forward related information to the Kansas bureau of investigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Motion to reconsider previous action. Failing to meet the required 2/3 majority the motion was rejected. - Yea: 18 Nay: 17 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Motion to move the bill above the line for consideration. Failing to reach a 2/3 majority the motion was rejected. - Yea: 24 Nay: 12 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 4 (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Motion to move the bill above the line for consideration. Failing to reach a 2/3 majority the motion was rejected. - Yea: 24 Nay: 12 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 4 (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to reconsider previous action. Failing to meet the required 2/3 majority the motion was rejected. Yea: 18 Nay: 17 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Motion to move the bill above the line for consideration. Failing to reach a 2/3 majority the motion was rejected. Yea: 24 Nay: 12 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-03-01 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 24, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 4 |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-15 | House | House Hearing: (neutral) Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2023-02-15 | House | House Hearing: (opponents) Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2023-02-13 | House | House Hearing: (proponents) Monday, February 13, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2023-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | House | House Introduced |