KS HB2280 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2280 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - Authorizing the prescribing and dispensing of medications for off-label use to prevent and treat COVID-19 infections and requiring child care facilities and schools to grant religious exemptions from vaccination requirements without inquiring into the sincerity of such religious beliefs.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2280 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - Authorizing the prescribing and dispensing of medications for off-label use to prevent and treat COVID-19 infections and requiring child care facilities and schools to grant religious exemptions from vaccination requirements without inquiring into the sincerity of such religious beliefs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 21 Nay: 16 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 8 (Y: 116 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 8 (Y: 116 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Conference |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Hilderbrand, Senator Gossage and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees |
2022-03-30 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Landwehr , Representative Eplee and Representative Ruiz, S. as conferees |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 21 Nay: 16 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be further amended and be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 26, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-04 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 4, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 8 |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2021-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2021-02-09 | House | House Introduced |