KS HB2279 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting housing protections for victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, human trafficking or stalking and requiring law enforcement officers to provide information about timing of release from custody when an arrest is made following a domestic violence call.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting housing protections for victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, human trafficking or stalking and requiring law enforcement officers to provide information about timing of release from custody when an arrest is made following a domestic violence call.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-18SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-03-06SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-28HouseHouse Engrossed on Wednesday, February 27, 2019
2019-02-28SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-02-21HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
2019-02-12HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-02-12HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback