KS HB2271 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposing a criminal penalty upon owners who allow livestock to run at large and allowing county sheriffs to seize such livestock that are on a highway.
Title
Imposing a criminal penalty upon owners who allow livestock to run at large and allowing county sheriffs to seize such livestock that are on a highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED |
2019-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2019-02-12 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2271/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2271_00_0000.pdf |